judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-5521
B-5521
09/10/1975
MISC PETITION
NORTH EAST FEDERATION OF TEACHER, LOCAL 3410, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO
M. L. BROCKETTE, COMMISSIONER OF EDUCATION, NORTH EAST INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT AND THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE NORTH EAST INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/10/1975Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
09/10/1975Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/07/1976Letter Filed
09/25/1975Motion to dismiss
09/22/1975Response to Motion filed
09/19/1975Response to Motion filed
09/10/1975Brief in Support of Petition
09/10/1975Exhibits in case/cause filed
09/10/1975Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusOverruled
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
North East Independent School District and the Board of Trustees of the North East Independent School DistrictRespondent
M. L. Brockette, Commissioner of EducationRespondent
North East Federation of Teacher, Local 3410, American Federation of Teachers, AFL-CIORelator
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information