judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-5518
B-5518
09/10/1975
Application for Writ of Error
RUSSELL M. RAYNER
JOHN BUIST CHESTER HOSPITAL, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/20/1975Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/02/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
09/10/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/19/1976Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
11/24/1975Response to Motion filed
11/20/1975Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/02/1975Response to Petition
09/10/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
09/10/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Russell M. RaynerPetitioner
John Buist Chester Hospital, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information