judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-94-00173-CR
03-94-00173-CR
04/01/1994
DWI
Michael Eugene Gibson
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/11/1996CASE STORED
11/04/1994Mandate Issued
08/17/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/29/1994Order Entered
06/16/1994Supplemental Statement of Facts Filed
05/18/1994Order EnteredRemanded
04/22/1994Second notice on overdue statement of facts
04/05/1994Statement of facts overdue
04/01/1994Transcript Filed
04/01/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/04/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State Prosecuting AttorneyInterested partyThe Honorable Matthew W. Paul
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasThe Honorable Charles D. Penick
Gibson, Michael EugeneAppellantMr. Michael Eugene Gibson
Court Of Criminal AppealsInterested partyThe Honorable Troy C. Bennett Jr.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law
Bastrop
21,770
120 days/$1000 fine