judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00533-CV
05-94-00533-CV
04/01/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Waldie, III, Walter B., Chjarles Durtschi, Walter B. Waldie,
Frank Cross & Frank Cross, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/20/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
04/20/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
04/05/1994MattConv
04/04/1994Exhibits Filed
04/04/1994MattConv
04/04/1994Statement of Facts Filed
04/01/1994Transcript Filed
04/01/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/24/1994Appeal Bond Filed
12/03/1993Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/20/1994Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
95th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Joe B Brown
88-15277-D