judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MYNIKIAH H. BUNDY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1438
Short Caption:MYNIKIAH H. BUNDY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD5991-10Filed Date:11/16/2010

Opening Event Date:11/16/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/30/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/28/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/25/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/12/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMynikiah H. Bundy Y
Rahkel BouchetYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/16/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Rahkel Bouchet, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
12/03/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Rahkel Bouchet, Esquire
12/21/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
12/21/2010RECEIVED- motion for appeal transcript
12/28/2010RECORD COPIES
12/28/2010RECORD INDEX
12/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (158 pgs/Tape - 10/18/2010 proc.) (w/CD)
12/30/2010RECORD COMPLETED
01/05/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/20/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until March 15, 2011 (no oppo)
02/02/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 15, 2011. (By: JAC)
02/23/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
02/23/2011APPENDIX (attached to brief)
03/22/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until April 28, 2011 (no oppo)
03/30/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before April 28, 2011. (By: JAC)
04/28/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
04/28/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/05/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/25/2011FiledSubmitted To Blackburne-Rigsby,Oberly,Schwelb
11/18/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge.)
12/12/2011FiledMandate