judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RODRIGUEZ (JOSE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38257
Short Caption:RODRIGUEZ (JOSE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 63191
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C158918Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/01/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/01/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-13002
08/06/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 23, 2001. Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. 01-13278
08/06/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 23, 2001. Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. 01-13280
08/08/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Proceedings: May 23, 2001. Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. Filed in district court on: July 31, 2001. 01-13404
09/14/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: September 17, 2001. 01-15538
09/19/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-15849
09/19/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 01-15850
10/01/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 6/22/99. Court Reporter: Robert Mintun. 01-16527
10/11/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-17197
10/11/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 01-17198
12/07/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. For the reasons stated in the attached order of the district court, we "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-20520
01/03/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-20780
01/03/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 8, 2002. 01-20780