judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00535-CV
05-94-00535-CV
04/01/1994
Miscellaneous civil
McCord, Brenda Lee & Andrew Jack McCord
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/20/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
04/20/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
04/06/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
04/04/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
04/01/1994Transcript Filed
04/01/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/22/1994Affidavit Filed
02/11/1994Affidavit Filed
12/03/1993Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/20/1994Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
305th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Donald Lane
92-1658-X