judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-94-00167-CV
13-94-00167-CV
04/01/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Pemelton, Billy Gene
Russell Trusts Partnership
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/08/1996Cite for opinions
02/02/1996Mandate Issued
12/14/1995Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
10/05/1995Submitted
10/05/1995Submission
09/28/1995Motion for Oral Argument DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/26/1995Additional Copies of Misc. Motion
09/21/1995Motion to allow oral argument.
09/06/1995Motion to allow oral argument.
08/02/1995Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
07/26/1995Submission
05/26/1994Brief Filed
05/26/1994Oral argument requested
05/02/1994Case ready to be set
05/02/1994Brief Filed
05/02/1994No oral argument requested
04/25/1994Letter filed
04/19/1994Statement Filed
04/19/1994Filing Fee Paid
04/01/1994Transcript Filed
04/01/1994Transcript Received
04/01/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/02/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Pemelton, Billy GeneAppellantVan A. Hutchins
Russell Trusts PartnershipAppelleeDarlene Vale
Trial Court Information
275th District Court
Hidalgo
Honorable Juan Ramon Partida
C-3089-87-E(1)