judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GEORGE R. WILLIAMS, III V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1437
Short Caption:GEORGE R. WILLIAMS, III V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD4608-10Filed Date:11/16/2010

Opening Event Date:11/16/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/04/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/04/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGeorge Randolph Williams, IIIYPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/16/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Walter Booth, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
12/03/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Walter Booth, Esquire
12/10/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
12/28/2010RECORD COPIES
12/28/2010RECORD INDEX
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (66pgs/Kaczorowski) 9/15-16/10 proc.
01/04/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/07/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
02/03/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until April 18, 2011 (no oppo)
02/11/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 18, 2011. (By: JAC)
04/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days (consent) (docketed on 4/27/11)
04/25/2011 On consideration of this court's order of February 11, 2011, granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix on or before April 18, 2011, and it appearing that the brief and limited appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order, submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the documents out of time. The motion shall set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
05/03/2011 ORDERED, ss, that this court's order of April 25, 2011, is hereby vacated. It is F/O that appellant's motion for extension of time is granted and the brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 18, 2011. (ETW)
05/05/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/05/2011APPENDIX
06/09/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
06/13/2011FiledTMC - motion for summary affirmance;OPPO
06/14/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSEto aple's motion for summary affirmance no oppo to 7/21/11
06/22/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION IS GRANTED and APPELLANT'S RESPONSE, if any, to appellee's motion for summary affirmance shall be filed NO LATER THAN JULY 21, 2011. (CASTILLO) LW
07/21/2011FiledOpposition to aple's motion for summary affirmance (Appellant)
08/10/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
08/10/2011FiledAffirmed
08/22/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Petition for Rehearing or Rehearing En Banc until September 7, 2011 (Appellant)
08/25/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET to file petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc on or before September 7, 2011. (Appellant)
09/02/2011FiledMotion For Leave To File Excess-Paged Petition for Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
09/02/2011LodgedPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
09/14/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's consent motion for leave to exceed page limit for petition for reh/reh en banc and the Clerk is directed to file the lodged petition.
09/14/2011FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
10/27/2011FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc
11/03/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
11/04/2011FiledMandate