judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SALMAN VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 38256
Short Caption:SALMAN VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/01/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 cash from Albert R. Salman.
08/01/2001Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Alternative Writ of Mandamus. 01-13041
08/22/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to proper person appellant Albert Salman. It has been determined that this petition arises out of a criminal matter, and therefore no filing fee was due. A refund has been requested. (Copy to AOC) 01-14201
09/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn3[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-15371
10/09/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 01-16989
10/09/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On September 12, 2001, this court denied petitioner's petition for a writ of mandamus. On September 24, 2001, this court received a proper person document labeled, "court does not have jurisdiction to dismiss petition for alterntive writ of mandamus." To the extent that petitioner requests any relief in his document, this court denies his request. 01-17845
10/23/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Albert Salman enclosing a form W-9 to facilitate the return of his filing fee. 01-17851