judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-94-00169-CV
03-94-00169-CV
04/01/1994
Tax
John Sharp, Comptroller of Public Accounts of the State of Texas; and Dan Morales, Attorney General of the State of Texas
Amsco Steel Company
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/23/2004Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/01/1997CASE STORED
01/17/1996Exhibits destroyed
12/18/1995Filing fee unpaid in Ct. of Appeals
12/18/1995Letter requesting pickup of exhibits
12/18/1995Mandate Issued
10/10/1995Case returned from higher court
08/30/1995Appl Writ to Supreme Court deniedMotion or Writ Denied
07/17/1995Designation filed
05/04/1995Case forwarded to higher court
04/26/1995Petition for writ of mandamus
03/29/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/08/1995Motion for rehearing filed
02/22/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed in part; Reversed and Rendered in part
01/25/1995Submitted
01/25/1995Submission
12/30/1994Oral argument acknowledged
12/29/1994Oral argument acknowledged
12/22/1994Submission
06/27/1994Case ready to be set
06/27/1994Brief filed
06/02/1994Brief filed
05/27/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
05/27/1994Statement of Facts Filed
05/20/1994Supplemental Transcript filed
05/11/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
05/06/1994Response requested (postcard)
05/06/1994Statement of Facts Received
05/05/1994Exhibits filed
05/05/1994Statement of Facts Filed
04/21/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
04/15/1994Supplemental Transcript filed
04/07/1994Response requested (postcard)
04/05/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
04/01/1994Transcript Filed
04/01/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sharp, Comptroller, John Of PuAppellantMr. William E. Storie
The Honorable Dan Morales
Amsco Steel CompanyAppelleeMr. Troy L. Voelker
Morales, Dan Attorney GeneralAppellantThe Honorable Dan Morales
Mr. William E. Storie
Trial Court Information
250th District Court
Travis
91-5685