judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00193-CV
02-89-00193-CV
08/18/1989
Workers Compensation
American Motorists Insurance Company
West, Durward Frank
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/16/1991Mandate Issued
03/05/1991Motion Filed
02/27/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/21/1990Submitted
02/21/1990Submission
01/05/1990Brief Filed
12/12/1989Brief Filed
10/27/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/26/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
10/17/1989No Description Available.
09/15/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/14/1989No Description Available.
09/12/1989Submission
09/12/1989No Description Available.
09/06/1989No Description Available.
08/18/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/16/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
American Motorists Ins. Co.Appellant
West, Durward FrankAppellee
Trial Court Information
235th District Court
Cooke
Honorable Leo Everett Young
87-495