judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARR (PAUL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38290
Short Caption:MARR (PAUL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR010509Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/09/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/09/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-13529
09/04/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: March 23, 2001. Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. 01-14935
09/14/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-15585
09/14/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-15587
10/05/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-16801
01/02/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. Vacating Judgment and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of conviction VACATED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-00018
01/29/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-00649
01/29/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/06/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 1, 2002. 02-00649