judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KALORAMA PARTNERS, LLC V. SPIRIT FINANCE CAPITAL MGT, ETAL

Case Information: 10-CV-1474
Short Caption:KALORAMA PARTNERS, LLC V. SPIRIT FINANCE CAPITAL MGT, ETALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA2-7328-10Filed Date:11/24/2010

Opening Event Date:11/24/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/03/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKalorama Partners LLCN
Paul C. RauserNN
AppelleeSpirit Finance Capital Management LLCN
Arjun Garg NN
AppelleeSpirit Finance CorporationN
Arjun Garg NN
AppelleeRedford Holdco LLCN
Arjun Garg NN
AppelleeMacquarie Capital (Usa) IncN
Arjun Garg NN
AppelleeCharles H. Cremens N
Arjun Garg NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/24/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/30/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY w/exhibit in support of aplt Kalorama
11/30/2010APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION to Appellant's Motion for Stay Pending Appeal.
12/01/2010TMC - appellant's EMERGENCY motion for stay - oppo
12/01/2010 ORDERED that the PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL PLEADINGS addressing the jurisdiction of the court by 9:00 am, THURSDAY DECEMBER 2, 2010. It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION for stay is HELD IN ABEYANCE pending the supplemental filings. (RDKRFA) (jl)
12/02/2010LETTER- from aple stating that all parties reached a settlement (filed by: Arjun Garg,Esq.)
12/02/2010 ORDERED that this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED AS MOOT. It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEES shall file an appropriate motion in the Superior Court withdrawing their subpoena duces tecum. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the CLERK SHALL ISSUE THE MANDATE FORTHWITH. (RDKRFA) (jl)
12/02/2010DISMISSED
12/03/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived