judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1175-89
PD-1175-89
08/18/1989
PDR Case Type
HUGHES, HENRY LANE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/04/1990BRIEF FILEDState
12/01/1989BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/26/1990MANDATE ISSD
10/10/1990OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
05/16/1990SUBMITTED
02/28/1990SET FOR SUBMIS
01/04/1990BRIEF FILED
01/02/1990NO BRIEF FILED
12/01/1989BRIEF FILED
11/01/1989PDR DISPGranted
09/19/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
08/18/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/26/1990STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
Hughes, Henry LaneApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Tim K. Banner
Hal E. Turley
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00780-CR
Aff 7-14-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
195th District Court
Dallas
Honorable JOE KENDALL
F87-72358-N