judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8972
C-8972
08/18/1989
App Writ of Error
LANA JOHNSON
THE STATE BAR OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
02/15/1990Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/05/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
08/18/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
03/26/1990Record returned to Court of AppealsREHEARING OVERRULED
03/21/1990Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruled
02/22/1990Motion for Rehearing forwarded
02/15/1990Motion for Rehearing
02/08/1990Notice requesting filing fee
01/24/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
09/26/1989Notice from Counsel of a change in address
09/07/1989Case forwarded to Court
09/07/1989No description available.
09/05/1989Reply to Response
08/18/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
03/26/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00895-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
Rule 90, 05-31-89
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable Warren Whitham
Trial Court Information
192nd District Court
Dallas
Honorable Harry Hopkins
86-8885-K