judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1168-89
PD-1168-89
08/18/1989
PDR Case Type
LAWSON, ROLLAND E.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/06/1989FINAL DISP/REHEARRefused
12/06/1989REHEAR DISPDENIED
11/30/1989SUPP BR ON MOT REHFiled
11/15/1989REHEAR FILED
11/01/1989PDR DISPRefused
09/19/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
08/18/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/08/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
LAWSON, ROLLAND E.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Walter C. Prentice
STATE OF TEXASStateRonald Earle
Court of Appeals Information:
03-87-00028-CR
Rev & Rem 8-9-89
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
167th District Court
Travis
Honorable Carl C. Anderson
83,153