judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00339-CR
13-89-00339-CR
08/18/1989
Unknown Criminal Case Type.
Williams, Darrell Darnell
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/12/1990Mandate Issued
10/08/1990Record returned to Court.
09/12/1990Higher Court DecisionRefused
07/26/1990Cite for opinions
06/28/1990Court of Crim. Appeals Number
05/24/1990Petition for Review
04/26/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
04/10/1990Motion for rehearing filed
03/29/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
02/01/1990Motion for leave to file brief DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
01/18/1990Submitted
01/18/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
01/18/1990Submission
01/17/1990Motion for leave to file brief
01/10/1990Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
01/04/1990State's (Crim) Brief Received
01/04/1990Brief Filed
12/20/1989Submission
12/05/1989Brief Filed
12/05/1989Case ready to be set
11/09/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/06/1989Sworn Statement filed
10/30/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/18/1989Due date for record to be filed
09/28/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/28/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
09/05/1989Transcript Filed
08/30/1989Green card in
08/24/198910 day letter sent
08/18/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/12/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Honorable B. B. Schraub