judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00992-CV
05-89-00992-CV
08/18/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Multi-Moto Corporation & Kenny Meazell
ITT Commercial Finance Corporation
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/15/1997Record RetentionRetain
06/12/1991Mandate Issued
06/12/1991Mandate Issued
05/28/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.Refused - No Reversible Error
03/04/1991Case Forwarded to Higher Court
03/04/1991MattConv
02/01/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
12/28/1990Mot-Ext to File Rehear DispMotion or Writ Granted
12/19/1990Mot to Ext Time File Rehearing
12/19/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
11/26/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
11/26/1990Substitute OpinionModified/Reformed and Affirmed
11/26/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/26/1990Motion for Rehearing Granted
11/26/1990Substitute OpinionModified/Reformed and Affirmed
09/21/1990Response to Motion
09/14/1990Response to Motion
09/14/1990Response to Motion
09/14/1990Response to Motion
09/11/1990Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/04/1990Motion for Leave to File
09/04/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/04/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
08/20/1990Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Denied
08/20/1990Opinion issuedOtherwise Disposed
08/20/1990Opinion issuedOtherwise Disposed
06/04/1990Response to Motion
05/25/1990Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
05/08/1990Submission
05/08/1990Submitted
05/08/1990Submission
05/08/1990Submitted
03/21/1990MattConv
03/16/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
01/08/1990Brief Filed
01/08/1990Case ready to be set
01/08/1990Case ready to be set
12/01/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/29/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/13/1989Brief Filed
11/01/1989Exhibits Filed
10/06/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/06/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/04/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/04/1989Motion for Leave to File
09/29/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/13/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/29/1989MattConv
08/29/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
08/18/1989Transcript Filed
08/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/26/1989Appeal Bond Filed
05/02/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/12/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
298th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Adolph P Canales
86-14479-M