judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-89-00400-CV
04-89-00400-CV
08/18/1989
Contract
Talmage Higginbotham, Indiv. and D/B/A Jewels by Talmage
Harold Freeman Jewelry Manufacturing Co., Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/08/1990Mandate Issued
01/08/1990Mandate Issued
11/22/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/22/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/08/1989Submitted
11/08/1989Submission
11/08/1989Submitted
10/11/1989No New Event but Update in Calendar
10/06/1989Submission
09/27/1989Brief Filed
09/27/1989Case ready to be set
09/27/1989Case ready to be set
09/13/1989Motion to Supplement Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/08/1989Brief Filed
09/07/1989No Description Available.
09/07/1989No Description Available.
08/25/1989Motion to Supplement Record Filed
08/18/1989No Description Available.
08/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/27/1989Appeal Bond Filed
05/04/1989Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/08/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
45th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Rose Spector
88-CI-12602
n/a