judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-89-00294-CV
08-89-00294-CV
08/18/1989
Other Personal Injury
Deerings West Nursing Center, a Division of Hillhaven Corp.
Scott, Velma Ponder
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/17/2011Case sent to State Archives
02/11/1992Fee paid
02/04/1991Fee paid
02/04/1991Mandate Issued
02/04/1991Shuck purged
02/04/1991Mandate Issued
11/09/1990Case Returned from Higher Court
11/09/1990Decision from Supreme Court or CCAMotion or Writ Denied
06/12/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
06/06/1990Fee paid
06/01/1990Application for Writ of Error
05/02/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
04/27/1990Fee paid
04/26/1990Fee paid
04/26/1990Fee paid
04/18/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/16/1990Fee paid
04/11/1990Motion - extend time to file a MFR - DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/29/1990Motion - extend time to file MFR - Filed
03/22/1990Fee paid
03/14/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/14/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/14/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/14/1990Payment of fee due requested
03/14/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/18/1990Submitted
01/18/1990Submission
01/18/1990Submitted
12/01/1989Submission
11/07/1989Brief Filed
11/07/1989Case ready to be set
11/07/1989Filed Ltr re req. for oral argument
11/07/1989Case ready to be set
10/13/1989Brief Filed
10/13/1989Filed Ltr re req. for oral argument
09/14/1989Fee paid
09/14/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/11/1989Payment of fee due requested
08/24/1989Supplemental Transcript Filed
08/18/1989Fee paid
08/18/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/18/1989Transcript Filed
08/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellantHon. John A. 'Jad' Davis
UnknownAppelleeHon. John H. Green
Trial Court Information
244th District Court
Ector
Honorable Joseph Connally
C-78,032