judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-89-00205-CV
12-89-00205-CV
08/18/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Smith County, Texas and Tyler, City of
Robertson, James S. d/b/a Cambridge Garden Homes, et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/18/2006Case has been destroyed/Records Retention Action
01/28/1994
01/28/1994Case stored
01/21/1994Mandate Issued
01/21/1994No Description Available.
01/05/1994Record returned.
11/17/1993No Description Available.Motion or Writ Denied
06/10/1993Filing Fee Paid
06/10/1993No Description Available.
05/10/1993Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
05/10/1993Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
05/10/1993Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
05/03/1993Response to Motion Filed
04/21/1993motion for rehearing filed
04/21/1993motion for rehearing filed
04/20/1993No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
04/20/1993Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
04/19/1993No Description Available.
04/06/1993Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
04/06/1993Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/26/1992Letter from the Court
09/21/1992Letter from the Court
09/17/1992Submitted
09/17/1992Submission
07/30/1992Submission
06/24/1992Letter from the Court
05/23/1991
05/23/1991Submitted
05/03/1991Submission
11/09/1989
11/06/1989Brief Filed
11/06/1989Case ready to be set
10/12/1989Brief Filed
10/12/1989Brief Filed
09/14/1989Motion or Writ Granted
09/14/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
09/12/1989
09/12/1989
09/01/1989motion for extension of time to file sfacts
08/18/1989No Description Available.
08/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/26/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/21/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/02/1989Motion For New Trial filed in trial court
05/05/1989Judgment from the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/2006Case DestroyedCase Destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Robertson, James S.AppelleeMr. James S. Robertson Jr.
Smith County, Texas And Tyler,AppellantMr. Randall J. Cook
Mr. Tracy Crawford
Smith CountyAppellant
Tyler, City OfAppellantHon. John M. Smith
Trial Court Information
114th District Court
Smith
Honorable Cynthia S. Kent
87-473-B