judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00991-CV
05-89-00991-CV
08/18/1989
Other Personal Injury
Key, James D., M. D.
Sherry Dedmon Alexander
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
10/15/1997Record RetentionDestroy
10/11/1989Collection letter on Filing Fee
09/11/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedDismissed
09/11/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedDismissed
08/25/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
08/18/1989Transcript Filed
08/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/24/1989Appeal Bond Filed
04/26/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
134th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Anne Ashby
86-288-G