judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00776-CV
14-89-00776-CV
08/18/1989
Mandamus/prohibition
Wilkerson, M.D., Robert G.
Solito, Judge Peter S. of the 164th Judicial District
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/07/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/29/1990Case stored
11/16/1989Opinion issuedOVERRULED
11/16/1989Opinion issuedOVERRULED
09/07/1989Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus DISPOSED-APP,REL,RESDENIED
08/30/1989Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
08/22/1989Court's request for a response
08/18/1989Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus FILED-APP,REL,RES
08/18/1989Petition for Writ of mandamus RECEIVED - REL
08/18/1989Petition for Writ of mandamus RECEIVED - REL
08/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentJudge, 164th District Court
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRelatorDavid A. Livingston
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentHon. Madelyn DeWoody
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRelatorDion C. Ramos
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentRay Hensarling
Trial Court Information
164th District Court
Harris
89-000389