judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8971
C-8971
08/18/1989
Mandamus/Cause
EMERALD OAKS HOTEL/CONFERENCE CENTER INC. ET AL.
THE HONORABLE ANTONIO A. ZARDENETTA JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
08/25/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRespondentPAN TEX HOTEL CORP ET AL.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
10/26/1989Phone call from Clerk's OfficeTO CHAS.FORTUNATO (REL.ATTY) WHO FILED MO/ENFORCE JUDG. - IS SATISFIED THAT JUDG.ENFORCED--SEE EVT.16. - PHL.
10/24/1989Order from Lower Court filedCOMPLYING WITH SUPREME COURT'S ORDER
10/16/1989Miscellaneous MotionNot acted on by the CourtMO TO ENFORCE JUDGMENT(FWD TO CS) (NOT ACTED ON BY THE COURT - DUE TO MOOTNESS - JUDGE VACATED ORDER/SEE EVT.16
10/03/1989Case StoredNO REHEARING FILED.
10/03/1989Cost letter issued776 SW2D 577
09/15/1989cover ltr with jmt
09/13/1989M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedWrit of Mandamus or Prohibition granted per R.122.W/PER CURIAM OPINION.
09/13/1989Motion for temporary relief disposedOverruled
09/13/1989Opinion issuedWrit of Mandamus conditionally grantedPER CURIAM OPINION 776 SW2D 577
09/13/1989Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedFILED DUE TO GRANT.
09/06/1989Relator's reply brief
08/25/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusPAN TEX HOTEL CORP ET AL.
08/18/1989Motion for temporary relief
08/18/1989Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
08/18/1989No description available.
08/18/1989Petition for writ received
08/18/1989Phone call from Clerk's OfficeCALL MADE-MCGINNIS LAW FIRM, SPOKE TO ARVIND SUDARSHAN, ADVISED ATTY. REPLY DUE BY AUGUST 28
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/03/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
PAN TEX HOTEL CORPORATIONRespondentMr. Don H. Magee
CASPERONE, JOSEPH E.RelatorMr. Michael F. Pezzulli
CLARK, ALLANRelatorMr. Michael F. Pezzulli
PEZZULLI, MICHAEL F.RelatorMr. Charles J. Fortunato
Court of Appeals Information:
04-89-00000-CV
Denied
4th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
111th District Court
Webb
Honorable Antonio A. Zardenetta
37,085