judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 11-96-00370-CR
11-96-00370-CR
11/15/1996
Robbery
Wilson, Andre Lee
The State of Texas
No
5th Court of Appeals
11/15/1996
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/02/1998Mandate issued
12/31/1997Yearly opinion book
11/26/1997Case returned from higher court
10/29/1997Petition for Discretionary Review in Criminal case or Petition for Review in Civil Case disposedRefused
08/04/1997Case forwarded to higher court
07/24/1997Petition for Discretionary Review in Criminal case or Petition for Review in Civil Case
06/16/1997Mot. on extension of time disposed in CCAMotion or Writ Granted
05/22/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/15/1997Submitted
05/15/1997Submission set in Eastland
05/08/1997Submission set in Eastland
11/15/1996Case ready to be set
11/15/1996Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
11/15/1996Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/02/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasBill Hill
Wilson, Andre LeeCriminal - AppellantJohn H. Hagler
Trial Court Information
282nd District Court
Dallas
Honorable Tom Price
F95-00295-HS
40 years