judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1619-96
PD-1619-96
11/15/1996
PDR Case Type
BOCKELMAN, EX PARTE JOHN STEVEN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/09/1996RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/27/1997FINAL DISPRefused
02/26/1997PDR DISPRefused
02/26/1997PDR DISPRefused
12/09/1996RESPONSE FILED
11/15/1996PDR FILED
11/15/1996PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/28/1997STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
BOCKELMAN, EX PARTE JOHN STEVEApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)James D. Granberry
STATE OF TEXASStateCarl Lewis
Court of Appeals Information:
13-96-00186-CR
AFF 10-10-96
13th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 3
Nueces
Honorable MARISELA SALDANA
96-139-3