judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1618-96
PD-1618-96
11/15/1996
PDR Case Type
STATE OF TEXAS V. BROWN, ROBERT HENRY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/07/1997FINAL DISPRefused
02/19/1997PDR DISPRefused
02/19/1997PDR DISPRefused
12/17/1996NO RESPONSE FILED
11/15/1996PDR FILED
11/15/1996PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/10/1997STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
BROWN, ROBERT HENRYApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)David M. Jordan
STATE OF TEXASStateCarl Lewis
Court of Appeals Information:
13-95-00081-CR
AFF 8-29-96
13th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
Nueces
Honorable HECTOR DEPENA, JR.
94-4640-2