judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 96-1128
96-1128
11/15/1996
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
DAVID B. McCALL JOHN C. NIEMEYER HELEN NIEMEYER MABEL SCHIELACK SHIRLEY HUBENAK H.L. NIEMEYER and MELVIN NIEMEYER
THE HONORABLE JACK E. HUNTER JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/29/1997Case StoredNo Rehearing Filed
11/27/1996Call receivedfrom relators' counsel; would like to withdraw exhibits & will file letter to that effect on Monday, 12/02/96
11/26/1996Motion for temporary relief disposedOverruled
11/26/1996M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruledas corrected
11/18/1996Correction filed (See Remarks)to mo/temporary relief
11/15/1996Motion for temporary reliefApplication for Temporary Relief
11/15/1996Exhibits receivedVol 1 (Orig + 2 Copies), Vol II (Orig + 2)
11/15/1996Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
11/15/1996Petition for writ received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
04/29/1997Case StoredCase stored.1F3 No Rehearing Filed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
NIEMEYER, MELVINRelatorMr. Britton D. Monts
HUBENAK, SHIRLEYRelatorMr. Tom C. McCall
TANA OIL AND GAS CORPORATIONRespondentMr. Christopher A. Bandas
Mr. Robin Clay Hoblit
SCHIELACK, MABELRelatorMr. Tom C. McCall
TECO GAS MARKETING COMPANYRespondentMr. Rodney R. Handel
ROWLING, ROBERTRespondentMr. Todd A. Hunter
MCCALL, DAVID B.RelatorMr. Tom C. McCall
NIEMEYER, JOHN C.RelatorMr. Tom C. McCall
NIEMEYER, H.L.RelatorMr. David B. McCall
NIEMEYER, HELENRelatorMr. Tom C. McCall
Court of Appeals Information:
13-96-00559-CV
Denied
___ SW2d ___, 11-14-96
13th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
94th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Jack E. Hunter
95-6143-C