judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1607-96
PD-1607-96
11/15/1996
PDR Case Type
HENK, EX PARTE DONALD LEE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/09/1996RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/27/1997FINAL DISPRefused
02/26/1997PDR DISPRefused
02/26/1997PDR DISPRefused
12/09/1996RESPONSE FILED
11/15/1996PDR FILED
11/15/1996PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/28/1997STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
HENK, EX PARTE DONALD LEEApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Jimmy Parks
STATE OF TEXASStateRobert L. Covington III
Court of Appeals Information:
04-95-00699-CR
AFF 10-23-96
4th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law
Guadalupe
Honorable LINDA Z. JONES
CCL-95-373