Case Information: 33477 | |||
Short Caption: | WAREMART VS. SMITH | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9703749 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/08/1999 / Levitt, Lansford | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/17/1998 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Kenneth R. Bick--check no. 10396. | ||
12/17/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 98-00402 | |
12/22/1998 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Larry R. Hicks. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
12/23/1998 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: September 21 and 22, 1998. To Court Reporter: Millie Terry of Molezzo Reporters. | 98-00496 | |
12/30/1998 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 98-00566 | |
01/08/1999 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. | ||
01/26/1999 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. 09/21/99 and 09/22/99 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Mildred J. Terry. | 99-00545 | |
02/23/1999 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 99-01226 | |
02/23/1999 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 99-01227 | |
03/03/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is hereby dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs." NRAP 42(b). SNP | 99-01482 | |
03/03/1999 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |