judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KENNETH J. ZALOUDEK, JR. v. BECKY ZALOUDEK

Case Heading (S-09-0016)
Case Number:S-09-0016Case Docketed On:01/20/2009
Linked To: S-09-0051
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:KENNETH J. ZALOUDEK, JR. v. BECKY ZALOUDEK
Full Title:KENNETH J. ZALOUDEK, JR., Appellant (Defendant), v. BECKY ZALOUDEK, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKenneth J. Zaloudek Jr.William L. Combs
AppelleeBecky ZaloudekRichard J. Mulligan
Heather Noble

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Marriage and Divorce - Property Division
Opinion Number:2009 WY 140
Citation:220 P.3d 498

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/20/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/20/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/20/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/20/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/03/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/04/2009Response/Objection - ExtensionResponse/ObjectionExtensionFinal
03/05/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Brief on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/06/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Brief on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/06/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/09/2009Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completion January 7, 2009 telephonic hearingRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
03/20/2009Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
04/02/2009Brief - Appellant; and statement of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
04/07/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of the Appellant (Untimely, one day late)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/01/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/04/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/12/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/15/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Heather Noble for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/18/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - William L. Combs for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/19/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/20/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/20/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of the AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/01/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/01/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers (three volumes) & Transcripts; Volume II, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/01/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/16/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (William Combs for appellant; Heather Noble for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/16/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/12/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/01/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/01/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/01/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/01/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/07/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/03/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal