judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARIA NUNEZ V. LAWRENCE R. WILLIAMS

Case Information: 10-CV-1484
Short Caption:MARIA NUNEZ V. LAWRENCE R. WILLIAMSClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead: 10-CV-0035 Consolidated:10-CV-1484
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB5610-07Filed Date:11/29/2010

Opening Event Date:11/29/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/17/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/05/2011
Argued/Submitted:04/05/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/26/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Appellant-Cross-AppelleeLawrence R. Williams N
John M. Howard NN
Appellee-Cross-AppellantMaria Nunez N
John E. DruryNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/16/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from the NON-FINAL and NON-APPEALABLE order of the Superior Court. DC Code 11-721 (2001). (BY: ETW)
12/16/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
01/05/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
03/11/2011 ORDERED that the SHOW CAUSE ORDER in 10CV1484 IS HEREBY VACATED. It is *****MORE*****
03/11/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPEAL NOS 10CV35 & 10CV1484 ARE CONSOLIDATED. It is *****MORE****
03/11/2011 F/ORDERED APPELLANT IN 10CV1484 shall w/n 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is *****MORE*****
03/11/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that this COURT'S 3/9/11 ORDER IN 10CV35 IS VACATED TO THE EXTENT that a SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ORDER shall issue in these consolidated appeals upon cmopletion of the record. It is FURTHER ORDERED that EITHER APPELLANT'S FAILURE to respond...shall subject their appeal to dismissal w/o further notice... (GLPRFE) (jl)
03/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (29-pgs/tape 10/22/10 proc.)w/cd
03/17/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (10CV1484) (RT-ORDERED/RT-NEEDED for 10/22/10) (elp)
03/17/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/18/2011RECORD INDEX 1ocv1484
03/28/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL-of denial to issue writ fieri facias (Nunez - Aple Cross Aplt - 10-CV-1484)
03/29/2011TMC - motion for summary reversal - motion to file (LODGED) brief - appellant's MISC motion to grant reversal - motion to file (LODGED) oppo to summary reversal - oppo to motion for leave to file (lodged) oppo
03/29/2011APLE-X-APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (Nunez)
03/29/2011RECEIVED - aple cross aplt brief
05/10/2011STATEMENT- from (Nunez) regarding motion for summary reversal filed on 3/28/11 as unopposed (no responsive pleading was filed)
05/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION to Motion for Summary Reversal (Aplt Cross Aple - Williams)
05/18/2011RECEIVED - Appellant/Cross Appellee Williams' Opposition to Motion for Summary Reversal
06/01/2011RECEIVED - aple's (Nunez) opposition to motion to late file motion to grant summary reversal
06/23/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANTXAPPELLEE'S MOTION to late file opposition to motion for summary reversal IS GRATNED and the Clerk shall file the LODGED OPPOSITION. It is ***MORE***
06/23/2011APPELLANT/CROSS-APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION
06/23/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEEXAPPELLANT'S MOTION to grant SUMMARY REVERSAL as being unopposed IS DENIED. It is ****MORE****
06/23/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEEXCROSS APPELLANT'S MOTION TO FILE LODGED BRIEF IN APPEAL NO 10CV35 IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the lodged brief. It is ****MORE****
06/23/2011APPELLEE/CROSS-APPELLANT'S BRIEF
06/23/2011 FURTHER ORDERED taht APPELLEEXAPPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL IN 10CV1484 IS DENIED as the issues of whether the trial court may issue a writ of fieri facias during the pendency of an appeal is not clear-cut... It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEEXAPPELLANT SHALL FILE HER BRIEF IN 10CV1484 W/N 30 DAYS... APPELLANTXAPPELLEE'S REPLY BRIEF shall be filed w/n 30 days thereafter. It is ****MORE*****
06/23/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the issue of a stay w/o imposition of a bond is REFERRED TO THE TRIAL COURT to impose a bond sufficient to cover the unsecured judgment and costs during the pendency of this appeal. (*GLRDTE) *JGL voted to grant summary reversal in 10CV1484
07/20/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)Granted
07/26/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
08/15/2011FiledBRIEF (Reply brief of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Nunez)
09/27/2011FiledOrder that appellant/cross-appellee shall submit the reply brief with 15 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave
11/10/2011FiledMotion For Summary Reversal (renewed) (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)Denied
11/15/2011FiledTMC/MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL
12/05/2011FiledORDER DENYING CROSS-APPELLANT'S RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL...
12/05/2011FiledBriefing Completed
12/05/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/19/2012FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)Denied
03/23/2012FiledOrder Denying aplt/cross-appellee's request for oral argument.
03/26/2012LodgedAnswer/Response to appellant's motion to request oral argument (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
04/05/2012FiledSubmitted To Thompson,Oberly,Pryor
08/30/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
09/26/2012FiledMandate