judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ASCENSION GOMEZ VASQUEZ, ET AL. v. BELL CAB COMPANY, INC.

Case: B-1273
B-1273
01/02/1969
Application for Writ of Error
ASCENSION GOMEZ VASQUEZ, ET AL.
BELL CAB COMPANY, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/02/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/24/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
01/20/1969Response to PetitionPetitioner
01/02/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/02/1969Response to Motion filed
04/02/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/24/1969Response to Petition
01/20/1969Response to Petition
01/07/1969Conditional application for writ of error filed
01/02/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/02/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bell Cab Company, Inc.Respondent
Ascension Gomez Vasquez, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information