judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1617-96
PD-1617-96
11/15/1996
PDR Case Type
STATE OF TEXAS V. TREVINO, DENNIS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/27/1997FINAL DISPRefused
02/26/1997PDR DISPRefused
02/26/1997PDR DISPRefused
12/17/1996NO RESPONSE FILED
11/15/1996PDR FILED
11/15/1996PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/28/1997STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateCarlos Valdez
Carl Lewis
TREVINO, DENNISApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Jon Kelly
Court of Appeals Information:
13-94-00598-CR
AFF 8-15-96
13th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
105th District Court
Nueces
Honorable J. MANUEL BANALES
94-CR-1624-D S-1