judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-96-01394-CV
14-96-01394-CV
11/15/1996
Mandamus/prohibition
Ron Gene Baker
The Honorable Jean Hughes
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/16/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
02/04/1997Case stored
01/09/1997Opinion issuedDISMISSED
01/09/1997Opinion issuedDISMISSED
01/08/1997Submitted
01/08/1997Submission
01/08/1997Submitted
01/07/1997Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus DISPOSED-APP,REL,RESOVERRULED
12/20/1996Response brief FILED-ANT,APE
12/17/1996Respondent's Brief Due
12/13/1996Supplement to motion FILED - ANT,APE,STA
12/11/1996Court's request for a response
11/15/1996Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus FILED-APP,REL,RES
11/15/1996Petition for Writ of mandamus RECEIVED - REL
11/15/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/16/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
BAKER, RON GENERelatorBernadette JohnLewis
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentLana S. Shadwick
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentJudge, County Criminal Court At Law #15
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 15
Harris
96-38854