judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1612-96
PD-1612-96
11/15/1996
PDR Case Type
COOPER, YUL TERRAH
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/27/1997FINAL DISPRefused
03/12/1997PDR DISPRefused
03/12/1997PDR DISPRefused
12/17/1996NO RESPONSE FILED
11/15/1996PDR FILED
11/15/1996PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/28/1997STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateTim Curry
COOPER, YUL TERRAHApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Michael L. Shepherd
Court of Appeals Information:
02-95-00087-CR
AFF 8-29-96
2nd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
297th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable EVERETT YOUNG
0546854D