judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1610-96
PD-1610-96
11/15/1996
PDR Case Type
KIDD, SCOTT BRYAN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/25/1997FINAL DISPRefused
04/09/1997PDR DISPRefused
04/09/1997PDR DISPRefused
12/17/1996NO RESPONSE FILED
11/15/1996PDR FILED
11/15/1996PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/01/1997STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Kidd, Scott BryanApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Sydney Young
STATE OF TEXASStateTom Wells
Court of Appeals Information:
06-95-00184-CR
AFF 8-23-96
6th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
6th District Court
Lamar
Honorable WEBB BIARD
15466