judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 96-1123
96-1123
11/15/1996
Second App Writ Error
BRANDY ODEM
WAL-MART STORES INC. and MARIA INEZ SAENZ
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/12/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/23/1997Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondenton behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. & Maria Inez SaenzSequence #: 02
04/14/1997Motion for RehearingPetitioneron behalf of Brandy OdemSequence #: 01
12/05/1996Reply to ResponseRespondenton behalf of Wal-Mart and Maria SaenzSequence #: 02
11/15/1996Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioneron behalf of Brandy OdemSequence #: 01
11/15/1996Reply to ResponseRespondentBrandy Odem's reply to respondents conditional cross point of error no. 1Sequence #: 01
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/12/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
07/31/1997Record returned to Court of Appealscase stored
06/12/1997Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruled
04/23/1997Notice requesting filing feereply to mo/re ($5.00); to J. Preston Wrotenbery
04/23/1997Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedon behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. & Maria Inez SaenzSequence #: 02
04/14/1997Conditional motion for rehearingNo description available.CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
04/14/1997Motion for Rehearingon behalf of Brandy OdemSequence #: 01
04/14/1997Motion for Rehearing forwardedRecord remains in the Clerk's OfficeSequence #: 01
03/27/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
03/27/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedon behalf of Brandy OdemSequence #: 01
03/27/1997Conditional app writ err disposedDismissedon behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.Sequence #: 02
12/09/1996Conditional application for writ of error filedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
12/09/1996Conditional application for writ of error filedon behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Maria Inez SaenzSequence #: 02
12/05/1996Reply to Responseon behalf of Wal-Mart and Maria SaenzSequence #: 02
12/04/1996Case forwarded to Court
11/15/1996Application for Writ of Error - Filedon behalf of Brandy OdemSequence #: 01
11/15/1996Reply to ResponseBrandy Odem's reply to respondents conditional cross point of error no. 1Sequence #: 01
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/31/1997Case StoredCase stored.27A4 record returned
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
WAL-MART STORES, INC.RespondentMs. Tina V. Snelling
Mr. Jaime Drabek
ODEM, BRANDYPetitionerMr. J. B. Peacock Jr.
Mr. Joseph Michael Guerra
Mr. Homer Mora
Mr. William J. Tinning
Mr. David T. Garcia
SAENZ, MARIA INEZRespondentMr. J. Preston Wrotenbery
The Honorable Kevin D. Jewell
Court of Appeals Information:
04-94-00693-CV
Aff As Ref
929 SW2d 513, 08-21-96
4th Court of Appeals
Honorable ANTONIO G. CANTU
Trial Court Information
79th District Court
Brooks
93-07-05632-CV