judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-96-00566-CV
13-96-00566-CV
11/15/1996
Miscellaneous civil
Driver, Timothy Ray
Scott, Wayne, Rochelle McKinney, M. Herkolotz, T. Garcia, Bell
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/2015Case stored
06/05/2015Record checked in
07/21/1998Mandate Issued
04/30/1998Opinion issuedDismissed
03/02/1998Green card in
02/25/199810 day letter sent
09/19/1997Green card in
09/15/199710 day letter sent
07/24/1997Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/16/1997Letter sent
07/09/1997request for documents
07/03/1997Miscellaneous Motion
07/03/1997Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/16/1997Miscellaneous Motion
05/30/1997Amended brief received.
05/30/1997No oral argument requested
05/28/1997Motion to amend ______________________
05/15/1997Letter sent
05/12/1997Green card in
05/07/1997Designation of Attorney
05/07/199710 day letter sent
04/24/1997No oral argument requested
04/24/1997Brief received.
03/27/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/17/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/28/1997Green card in
02/27/1997Address Change
02/24/199710 day letter sent
02/06/1997Supplemental transcript filed
02/06/1997Supplemental transcript recieved
12/30/1996Document Received
12/17/1996Document Received
12/16/1996Statement Filed
12/05/1996Green card in
12/02/1996Statement Filed
11/25/199610 day letter sent
11/15/1996Transcript Filed
11/15/1996Transcript Received
11/15/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/21/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Scott, Wayne Rochelle MckinneAppelleeLisa M. Murray
Driver, Timothy RayAppellantTimothy Ray Driver
Trial Court Information
135th District Court
De Witt
Honorable Kemper Stephen Williams
96-5-17,176