judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-96-01817-CR
05-96-01817-CR
11/15/1996
Other Felony
Burrell, Tony Lamont
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/23/2003Return to storage
01/17/2003Letter Sent by the Court
01/03/2003Letter Received
05/23/2000Return to storage
03/06/2000Record Returned
10/07/1999Record Shipped
05/17/1999Mandate Issued
05/17/1999Mandate Issued
04/26/1999Record Returned
03/31/1999Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
12/09/1998Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
12/08/1998Record Shipped
10/30/1998Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
08/31/1998Ext to file Petition for Discretionary Review DispMotion or Writ Granted
07/29/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/29/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/05/1998Submitted
05/05/1998Submission
05/05/1998Submitted
04/03/1998Letter Filed
03/17/1998Letter Filed
03/09/1998Submission
02/24/1998Brief Filed
09/16/1997Case ready to be set
09/16/1997Case ready to be set
09/08/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ No Action Taken
09/05/1997MattConv
09/05/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/12/1997Brief Filed
08/11/1997MattConv
07/21/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/11/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/11/1997Notice To Appellant that Brief is late
07/02/1997MattConv
06/05/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/04/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/14/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/10/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/02/1997MattConv
03/20/1997Transcript Due
03/05/1997Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
03/04/1997Transcript Filed
02/28/1997Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
02/26/1997Statement of Facts Filed
02/25/1997Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Granted
02/21/1997Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
02/19/1997Statement of Facts Filed
02/18/1997Record due
11/21/1996Notice Sent
11/15/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/30/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
10/21/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
10/21/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/17/1999Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasPatricia Poppoff Noble
Burrell, Tony LamontCriminal - AppellantJohn H. Hagler
Trial Court Information
282nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Robert George Dohoney
F96-02543-US
25 Yrs TDC