judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-96-00567-CV
13-96-00567-CV
11/15/1996
Miscellaneous civil
Debord, John, et al.
Circle Y of Yoakum, Inc., et al.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/24/1998Mandate Issued
04/06/1998Cite for opinions
02/13/1998Higher Court DecisionReversed and Dismissed
09/12/1997Supreme Court Number
09/03/1997Application of Writ of Error sent to Supreme Court
08/29/1997Writ Filed
08/29/1997Writ of Error Fee Paid
08/07/1997Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
07/09/1997Motion for rehearing filed
06/26/1997Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
06/26/1997Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/12/1997Supplemental citation
05/12/1997Reply to _______
05/08/1997Submitted
05/08/1997Supplemental citation
05/08/1997Submission
04/29/1997Reply Brief Filed
03/25/1997Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
03/10/1997Submission
01/09/1997Motion for Dismissal DisposedCarried with the case
12/19/1996Page filed
12/18/1996Response to _____________.
12/12/1996Green card in
12/12/1996Green card in
12/10/1996Oral argument requested
12/10/1996Brief Filed
12/10/1996Motion for Dismissal Filed
12/10/1996Statement Filed
12/05/1996Statement Filed
11/26/1996Supplemental transcript filed
11/26/1996Supplemental transcript recieved
11/22/1996Response to _____________.
11/20/199610 day letter sent
11/15/1996Case ready to be set
11/15/1996Statement of Facts Filed
11/15/1996Transcript Filed
11/15/1996Brief Filed
11/15/1996Brief received.
11/15/1996Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
11/15/1996Statement of Facts Received
11/15/1996Filing Fee Paid
11/15/1996Oral argument requested
11/15/1996Transcript Received
11/15/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/24/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Circle Y Of Yoakum, Inc.AppelleeRobert S. Harrell
Hon. Bill W. Russell
Hon. Ronald B. Walker
David A. Smith
David W. Jones
Debord, John Et Al.AppellantJames R. Harris
Hon. Andrew M. Greenwell
Trial Court Information
24th District Court
De Witt
Honorable Ronald Guy Carr
93-2-16,071