judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FREDERIK MARINUS TOMBROEK v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0015)
Case Number:S-09-0015Case Docketed On:01/16/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Converse CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:FREDERIK MARINUS TOMBROEK v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:FREDERIK MARINUS TOMBROEK, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantFrederik Marinus TombroekDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Diane Elizabeth Courselle
Whitney Michak
Janae E. Ruppert
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence, Evidence
Opinion Number:2009 WY 126
Citation:217 P.3d 806

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/16/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/16/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/03/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/04/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/04/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/31/2009Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance by Diane E. Courselle, Director DAP and Whitney Michak, Student Intern. Called DAP and requested original copy of Consent of ClientNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
04/08/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Consent of Client for Whitney Michak to appear on behalf of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/20/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/20/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for AppellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
06/03/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/04/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/18/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
06/19/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk. (Notified counsel for Appellant Consent and Approval form needed.)Notice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/22/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/26/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/26/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, five volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential Folder; Volumes III-IV, Transcripts; Volume V, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/26/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/29/2009Notice-Incoming - Consent of Client for Janae Ruppert to appear on behalf of AppellantNotice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
06/29/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham Smith for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/10/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Janae Ruppert for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/12/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Diane E. Courselle, Director, DAP and Janae E. Ruppert, Student Intern, argument by Ms. Ruppert for appellant; Graham Macdonald Smith, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/12/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/16/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/02/2009Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
11/02/2009Brief - In Support of Petition for RehearingBriefIn Support of Petition for RehearingFinal
11/03/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for Rehearing and Appellant's Brief in Support of Petition for RehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/05/2009Service - Certificate of service inadvertently left off of Petition for RehearingServiceCertificate of serviceFinal
11/17/2009Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
11/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/17/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/17/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/19/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 11/18/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal