judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LILLIE M. MIDDLEBROOKS V. NORMA P. FUENTES, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1483
Short Caption:LILLIE M. MIDDLEBROOKS V. NORMA P. FUENTES, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - General Civil (CAB)
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB2997-10Filed Date:11/24/2010

Opening Event Date:11/24/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/27/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:03/07/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/13/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/19/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLillie M. Middlebrooks NPro SeN
AppelleeNorma P. Fuentes N
Simon J. Torres YN
Karen E. Gray NN
Appellee Raimo N
Simon J. Torres YN
AppelleeJanice Corazza N
Simon J. Torres YN
AppelleeKaiheem J. Mason N
Simon J. Torres YN
AppelleeKatherine Polk Chandler N
Simon J. Torres YN
AppelleeSt. Coletta of Greater Washington Inc.N
Simon J. Torres YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/24/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/14/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on November 24, 2010, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
12/27/2010RECORD INDEX
12/27/2010RECORD COMPLETED
01/04/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
02/04/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
02/04/2011APPENDIX
02/04/2011NOTICE RECEIVED- from aplt re: appendix *Stating that appellant has no objection to appellee filing a supplemental appendix at their expense) (elp)
03/07/2011APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE - to aplt's notice regarding appendix *Requsting an order directing appellant to reimbure appellee's fees incurred for filing a supplemental appendix (elp)
03/07/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
03/07/2011APPENDIX aple
03/07/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/22/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
03/25/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
04/14/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of June 2011 through Sept 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by APR. 22, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
07/27/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/13/2011LodgedArgued Before Gllickman,Yhompson,Nebeker Lillie M.Middlebrooks for appellant Pro Se Heather S.Gelfuso Esq. for appellee
09/27/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Nebeker, Senior Judge)
10/05/2011FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
12/09/2011FiledOrder Denying appellant's pet for reh/reh en banc
12/19/2011FiledMandate