judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-96-00359-CV
09-96-00359-CV
11/15/1996
Miscellaneous civil
Marlowe, Johnny d/b/a Twin City Housing
White, Dudley, Jr. and wife Mary White
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/04/1998Mandate Issued
08/04/1998MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED
05/21/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/12/1998Submitted
03/12/1998Submission
03/11/1998ORAL ARGUMENT WAIVED
03/05/1998ORAL ARGUMENT WAIVED
12/16/1997Submission
03/11/1997Brief Filed
03/11/1997Case ready to be set
02/18/1997Brief Filed
01/16/1997Order Entered
11/22/1996Response
11/19/1996Statement of Facts Filed
11/19/1996Transcript Filed
11/19/1996Transcript Received
11/15/1996Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
11/15/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/11/1996Statement of Facts Received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/04/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Marlow, Johnny D/b/a Twin CityAppellantJohn Henry Tatum
White, Jr., Dudley And Wife MaAppelleeCharles Meyers
Trial Court Information
159th District Court
Angelina
Honorable Gerald A Goodwin
25959