judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-96-01395-CR
14-96-01395-CR
11/15/1996
Robbery
Brown, Tyrone D.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/11/2002Misc motion DISPOSEDDENIED
07/11/2002Misc motion DISPOSEDDENIED
07/03/2002Misc Motion filed
07/03/2002Misc Motion filed
01/22/1998Case stored
01/20/1998Mandate due to be issued
01/20/1998Mandate Issued
01/20/1998Mandate Issued
01/05/1998Record RETURNED from Higher Court
12/03/1997Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
10/20/1997Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
10/03/1997Motion for rehearing DUE
09/18/1997Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
09/18/1997Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
09/17/1997Submitted
09/17/1997Submission
09/17/1997Submitted
08/28/1997Order Entered
05/30/1997Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/30/1997Case ready to be set
05/30/1997Case ready to be set
05/29/1997State's brief DUE
05/01/1997Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/01/1997Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
04/28/1997Brf.RECD.No Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA,
04/28/1997Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/25/1997Past due brief
04/21/1997Appellant's brief DUE
03/21/1997Statement of Facts Due
03/21/1997Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
12/20/1996Record due
12/20/1996Statement of Facts Due
12/19/1996Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
12/16/1996Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
12/05/1996Transcript FILED
11/15/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/12/1996Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
10/21/1996Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/20/1998Case StoredCase stored
05/11/2017Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasDavid P. Weeks
Philip L. Hall
Brown, Tyrone D.Criminal - AppellantStephen C. Taylor
Tyrone D. Brown
Trial Court Information
278th District Court
Walker
19,023-C
25 Years TDCJ