judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00241-CR
02-89-00241-CR
09/25/1989
Robbery
Baston, Jr., Sammy J.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/10/1990Mandate Issued
10/19/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/30/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
08/20/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
07/12/1990Motion for Extension to File Supp. Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/09/1990Motion for Extension to File Supp. Brief Filed
07/09/1990No Description Available.
06/27/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/20/1990Motion Filed
05/31/1990Letter
02/06/1990Brief Filed
02/06/1990Case ready to be set
01/12/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
12/20/1989Letter
12/20/1989Order Entered
12/15/1989Brief Filed
11/16/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/15/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
10/16/1989Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
09/25/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/10/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Baston, Jr., Sammy J.Criminal - Appellant
Unknown UserCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1
Tarrant
Honorable Leo Everett Young
218375D
8 yrs., TDC