judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-89-00226-CV
10-89-00226-CV
09/25/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Constance Rene Brown, et al
Martin Gas Sales, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/10/2002Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
09/30/1991Case stored
09/30/1991Mandate issued by this Court
09/11/1991(NO ACK) Writ disposed.Reversed and Remanded
06/19/1991(NO ACK) Writ disposed.Motion or Writ Granted
07/24/1990No Description Available.
06/21/1990Motion for Rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/13/1990Response to motion
06/01/1990No Description Available.
05/17/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/19/1990No Description Available.
03/12/1990No Description Available.
03/08/1990Submitted
03/08/1990Submission
01/11/1990Dismissal on Order with no OpinionMotion or Writ Granted
11/20/1989Submission
11/20/1989No Description Available.
11/02/1989No Description Available.
10/26/1989Motion for dismissal filed
10/24/1989No Description Available.
09/25/1989No Description Available.
09/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/10/2002Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Brown, Constance ReneAppellantDavid J. Salinsky
Bill Sherbert
Martin Gas Sales, Inc.AppelleeJohn M. Weaver
R. Michael Northrup
Trial Court Information
13th District Court
Navarro
Honorable Kenneth J. Douglas
461-89