judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1301-89
PD-1301-89
09/25/1989
PDR Case Type
BRYANT, RICHARD EARL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/08/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/26/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/25/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
BRYANT, RICHARD EARLApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Jimmy A. Ashby
STATE OF TEXASStateN. A. Irsfeld
Court of Appeals Information:
11-88-00235-CR
Rev & Rem 8-17-89
11th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
29th District Court
Palo Pinto
Honorable DAVID CLEVELAND
8603