judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1300-89
PD-1300-89
09/25/1989
PDR Case Type
WILLIAMS, SIDNEY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/08/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/26/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/25/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Williams, SidneyApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Grant U. Hardeway, Sr.
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Holmes
Court of Appeals Information:
11-89-00213-CR
Dism 9-14-89
11th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
230th District Court
Harris
Honorable Joe Kegans
499542